BILL NUMBER: SB 229ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Roth (Coauthor: Senator Stone) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Obernolte) FEBRUARY 13, 2015 An act relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 229, Roth. Courts: judgeships. Existing law allocates additional judgeships to the various counties in accordance with uniform standards for factually determining additional need in each county, as approved by the Judicial Council. Existing law authorizes 50 additional judges, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to be allocated to the various county superior courts, pursuant to uniform criteria approved by the Judicial Council. This bill would appropriate $5,000,000 from the General Fund for the purpose of funding 12 superior court judge positions in judgeships currently authorized by the Legislature. The bill would require the Judicial Council to determine which positions are funded, pursuant to that uniform criteria. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of five million dollars ($5,000,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund for the purpose of funding 12 new superior court judgeships, and accompanying staff, as authorized pursuant to Section 69614.2 of the Government Code. The Judicial Council shall determine the allocation of the funded judgeships pursuant to the uniform criteria described in subdivision (b) of Section 69614 of the Government Code, as updated and approved by the Judicial Council.