Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 1193.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|