|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 839.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|