Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | April 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |