Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | May 11 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |