08/11/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/11/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/30/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 635.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |