|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 606, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2662.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 2899.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1286.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1150.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
April 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|