California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015