|
06/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2016
|
Became law without Governor's signature.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 3975.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3894.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3877.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 18 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4784.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|