Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
May 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|