Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Reconsideration granted. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 23. Noes 43. Page 2814.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|