California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB261 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill March 24, 2015