Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | May 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | May 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 594.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |