Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |