|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5324.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5878.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
June 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 532.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|