California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015