|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 795, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2564.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2923.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
June 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2015
|
June 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 931.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|