California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2015

Amended

Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015