Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 07/14/2015 | July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 5. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1703.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |