LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB276
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB276
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB276
Compare Versions
SB276 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB276 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB276 Amended July 16, 2015
SB276 Amended July 7, 2015
SB276 Amended April 20, 2015
SB276 Amended March 26, 2015
SB276 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB276 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB276 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB276 Amended July 16, 2015
SB276 Amended July 7, 2015
SB276 Amended April 20, 2015
SB276 Amended March 26, 2015
SB276 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare