08/07/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/07/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/30/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2424.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5). | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |