Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | May 12 set for second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Joint Rule 61(a)(2) suspended. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 844.) | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |