Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | January 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2015 | Set for hearing January 5. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | April 21 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | April 7 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |