California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB29 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/02/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 29AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 15, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Beall (Principal coauthor: Senator Mitchell) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Hancock, Leno, Monning, and Stone) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Chvez, Frazier,  Low,  and Maienschein) DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add Sections 13515.28 and 13515.29 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officer training standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 29, as amended, Beall. Peace officer training: mental health. Existing law requires specified categories of law enforcement officers to meet training standards pursuant to courses of training certified by the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training (POST). Existing law requires POST to include in its basic training course adequate instruction in the handling of persons with developmental disabilities or mental illness, or both. Existing law also requires POST to establish and keep updated a continuing education classroom training course relating to law enforcement interaction with developmentally disabled and mentally ill persons. This bill would require POST to require field training officers who are instructors for the field training program to have  40   20  hours of promising or evidence-based behavioral health training, as specified. The bill would also require POST to require as part of its field training program 20 hours of field training relating to law enforcement interaction with persons with mental illness or intellectual disability, to be completed as specified. By requiring local law enforcement field training officers to have  40   20  additional hours of training and imposing additional training costs on local law enforcement agencies, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13515.28 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 13515.28. (a) (1) The Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training shall require the field training officers who provide instruction in the field training program to have  40   20  hours of promising or evidence-based behavioral health training to deescalate a situation where an officer is interacting with persons with mental illness or intellectual disability. (2) If an officer has completed  40   20  hours of promising or evidence-based behavioral health training, the requirement described in paragraph (1) shall not apply. Instead, the officer is strongly encouraged to take a four-hour behavioral health refresher course. (b) This promising or evidence-based behavioral health training course shall address issues relating to stigma, shall be culturally relevant and appropriate, and shall include all of the following topics: (1) The cause and nature of mental illnesses and intellectual disabilities. (2) (A) How to identify indicators of mental illness, intellectual disability, and substance use disorders. (B) How to distinguish between mental illness, intellectual disability, and substance use disorders. (C) How to respond appropriately in a variety of situations involving persons with mental illness, intellectual disability, and substance use disorders. (3) Conflict resolution and deescalation techniques for potentially dangerous situations. (4) Appropriate language usage when interacting with potentially emotionally distressed persons. (5) Community and state resources available to serve persons with mental illness or intellectual disability, and how these resources can be best utilized by law enforcement. (6) The perspective of individuals and families with lived experiences with persons with mental illness, intellectual disability, and substance use disorders. SEC. 2. Section 13515.29 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 13515.29. The Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training shall require as part of its  existing  field training program 20 hours of field training relating to law enforcement interaction with persons with mental illness or intellectual disability to be completed during the employing department's field training and probationary period. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.