LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB29
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB29
Compare Versions
SB29 Chaptered October 3, 2015
SB29 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB29 Amended August 31, 2015
SB29 Amended July 8, 2015
SB29 Amended June 2, 2015
SB29 Amended April 15, 2015
SB29 Amended March 23, 2015
SB29 Amended February 26, 2015
SB29 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB29 Chaptered October 3, 2015
SB29 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB29 Amended August 31, 2015
SB29 Amended July 8, 2015
SB29 Amended June 2, 2015
SB29 Amended April 15, 2015
SB29 Amended March 23, 2015
SB29 Amended February 26, 2015
SB29 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare