|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2777.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3182.) Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3182.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 3182.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 881.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 797.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|