LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB296
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB296
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB296
Compare Versions
SB296 Amended August 28, 2015
SB296 Amended July 2, 2015
SB296 Amended April 20, 2015
SB296 Amended April 7, 2015
SB296 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB296 Amended August 28, 2015
SB296 Amended July 2, 2015
SB296 Amended April 20, 2015
SB296 Amended April 7, 2015
SB296 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare