|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 271, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 545.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|