Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | April 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |