|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 713, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2368.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
June 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 926.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|