09/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2015. | |||
09/21/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2692.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26). | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1985.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1911.) (July 13). | ||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2015 | Set for hearing July 13. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |