Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 816.) (April 28). | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |