|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 742.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|