Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|