Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 2944.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 919.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 722.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|