Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1151.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 860.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|