Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|