Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1151.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 920.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|