Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |