|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2663.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|