LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB324
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB324
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB324
Compare Versions
SB324 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB324 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB324 Amended September 4, 2015
SB324 Amended August 17, 2015
SB324 Amended July 15, 2015
SB324 Amended April 15, 2015
SB324 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB324 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB324 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB324 Amended September 4, 2015
SB324 Amended August 17, 2015
SB324 Amended July 15, 2015
SB324 Amended April 15, 2015
SB324 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare