|
10/05/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 506, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2770.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be taken up for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2787.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3126.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 883.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|