07/15/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/15/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |