Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | April 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |