California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015