07/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/02/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/24/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |