Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|