California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015