Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | April 20 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |