|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2271.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2623.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 835.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 593.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|